MI HB5525 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned Pa 61'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned Pa 61'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; general; provide for 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; general; provide for 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 154 (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 110 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 110 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Assigned Pa 61'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/11/2022 08:40 Am |
2022-03-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 04/07/2022 12:06 Pm |
2022-04-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/28/2022 01:44 Pm |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 154 Yeas 98 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-03-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-03-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 110 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | House | Transmitted |
2022-01-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 101 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-01-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-11-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/03/2021 |
2021-11-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-11-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |