MI HB5525 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-04 - Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs
Pending: Senate Local, Urban & State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-04 - Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs
Pending: Senate Local, Urban & State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Counties; other; farmers markets and flea markets; allow establishment of. Creates new act.
Title
Counties; other; farmers markets and flea markets; allow establishment of. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Barnett [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Rep. Marie Donigan [D] | Sen. Vincent Gregory [D] |
Rep. Gail Haines [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Rep. Ellen Lipton [D] | Rep. Tim Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-04 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs | |
2009-10-29 | Transmitted | |
2009-10-29 | Title Amended | |
2009-10-29 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 518 Yeas 104 Nays 2 | |
2009-10-29 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-10-29 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-29 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-10-29 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-10-29 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-10-27 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-27 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-10-21 | Printed Bill Filed 10/21/2009 | |
2009-10-20 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2009-10-20 | Read A First Time | |
2009-10-20 | Introduced By Representative Marie Donigan |