MI HB5523 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 478'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 478'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; privacy; access information for social networking account of employees and students; prohibit employers and education institutions from requiring disclosure. Creates new act.
Title
Civil rights; privacy; access information for social networking account of employees and students; prohibit employers and education institutions from requiring disclosure. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 837 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 888 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 519 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 888 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 519 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 478'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:00 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:48 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2012 @ 11:50 Am |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 837 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 888 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-12 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2012-09-12 | House | Title Amended |
2012-09-12 | House | Passed Roll Call # 519 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-09-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-12 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2012-09-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2012-04-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/29/2012 |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Aric Nesbitt |
Subjects
Civil rights, employment discrimination
Civil rights, privacy
Education, other
Higher education, other
Labor, discrimination
Labor, fair employment practices
Civil rights, privacy
Education, other
Higher education, other
Labor, discrimination
Labor, fair employment practices