MI HB5508 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-13 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-13 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures; revised judicature act; revise to reflect distribution of certain fines to school districts. Amends secs. 8379 & 8396 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8379 & 600.8396).
Title
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures; revised judicature act; revise to reflect distribution of certain fines to school districts. Amends secs. 8379 & 8396 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8379 & 600.8396).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 427 (Y: 88 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-09-28 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 427 Yeas 88 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-11-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/02/2021 |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |