MI HB5508 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; associations; merger or conversion of summer resort and park association into nonprofit corporations; authorize. Amends 1897 PA 230 (MCL 455.1 - 455.24) by adding sec. 19. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5509'18
Title
Businesses; associations; merger or conversion of summer resort and park association into nonprofit corporations; authorize. Amends 1897 PA 230 (MCL 455.1 - 455.24) by adding sec. 19. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5509'18
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Inman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 212 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 212 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2018-04-11 | House | Transmitted |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 212 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-04-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/31/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Larry Inman |
Subjects
Businesses: associations
Businesses: nonprofit corporations
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Businesses: nonprofit corporations
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs