MI HB5504 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-13 - Assigned Pa 331'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-13 - Assigned Pa 331'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; statute of limitations; limitations period under uniform fraudulent transfer act for action relating to qualified dispositions in trust act; modify. Amends secs. 1, 4 & 9 of 1998 PA 434 (MCL 566.31 et seq.).
Title
Civil procedure; statute of limitations; limitations period under uniform fraudulent transfer act for action relating to qualified dispositions in trust act; modify. Amends secs. 1, 4 & 9 of 1998 PA 434 (MCL 566.31 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 665 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-13 | House | Assigned Pa 331'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/8/2016 @ 11:28 Am |
2016-12-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/8/2016 @ 9:04 Am |
2016-12-06 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/5/2016 @ 4:18 Pm |
2016-12-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 665 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-22 | House | Transmitted |
2016-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 96 Nays 11 |
2016-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-03-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |
Same As/Similar To
SB0598 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary