MI HB5503 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 155'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 155'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Construction: fire safety; use of lock block devices on classroom doors and certain types of door locks; allow. Amends sec. 28 of 1972 PA 230 (MCL 125.1528). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4689'19, HB 5502'20
Title
Construction: fire safety; use of lock block devices on classroom doors and certain types of door locks; allow. Amends sec. 28 of 1972 PA 230 (MCL 125.1528). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4689'19, HB 5502'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 280 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Assigned Pa 155'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/17/2020 11:40 Am |
2020-09-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/17/2020 10:25 Am |
2020-09-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/14/2020 01:45 Pm |
2020-09-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 280 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-02-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |