MI HB5502 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Fire; other; use of lock block devices on classroom doors and certain types of door locks; allow. Amends sec. 22 of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.22). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4689'19, HB 5503'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire; other; use of lock block devices on classroom doors and certain types of door locks; allow. Amends sec. 22 of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.22). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4689'19, HB 5503'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-03-11HouseTransmitted
2020-03-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-03-11HouseRead A Third Time
2020-03-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-03-10HouseRead A Second Time
2020-03-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-03-03HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-02-25HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-02-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/20/2020
2020-02-19HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-02-19HouseRead A First Time
2020-02-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Scott Vansingel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback