MI HB5497 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-13 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-13 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration; permanent registration sticker; provide for ORVs used for law enforcement. Amends sec. 81116 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.81116).
Title
Vehicles; registration; permanent registration sticker; provide for ORVs used for law enforcement. Amends sec. 81116 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.81116).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-13 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-13 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-10-06 | Printed Bill Filed 10/02/2009 | |
2009-10-01 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-10-01 | Read A First Time | |
2009-10-01 | Introduced By Representative Joel Sheltrown |