MI HB5491 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 208'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Marihuana: administration; court-appointed individual to operate marihuana establishment; allow, and require promulgation of rules to establish procedures. Amends secs. 3 & 8 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27953 & 333.27958) & adds sec. 9a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marihuana: administration; court-appointed individual to operate marihuana establishment; allow, and require promulgation of rules to establish procedures. Amends secs. 3 & 8 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27953 & 333.27958) & adds sec. 9a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 132 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14HouseAssigned Pa 208'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:28 Pm
2020-10-14HouseApproved By The Governor 10/15/2020 09:58 Am
2020-10-01HousePresented To The Governor 10/01/2020 01:24 Pm
2020-09-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-09-24HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-09-24HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-09-23SenateInserted Full Title
2020-09-23SenatePassed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-09-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-07-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-07-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-07-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-03-04SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2020-03-03HouseTransmitted
2020-03-03HouseTitle Amended
2020-03-03HousePassed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 132 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-03-03HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-02-26HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-25HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-02-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/18/2020
2020-02-13HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-02-13HouseRead A First Time
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5491
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5491.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBH-5491.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBS-5491.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2020-HNB-5491.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0208.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-02-25-020.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-03-023.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-07-22-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-23-072.htm

Bill Comments

feedback