MI HB5486 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Assigned Pa 152'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Assigned Pa 152'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection: consumer solicitation; failure of online marketplaces and high-volume third-party sellers to obtain or disclose certain information; make unfair trade practice. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 331 (MCL 445.903).
Title
Consumer protection: consumer solicitation; failure of online marketplaces and high-volume third-party sellers to obtain or disclose certain information; make unfair trade practice. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 331 (MCL 445.903).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | Assigned Pa 152'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:04 Pm |
2022-07-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/19/2022 09:42 Am |
2022-07-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2022 12:56 Pm |
2022-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-21 | House | Title Amended |
2022-06-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 91 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2022-06-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) |
2021-10-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/27/2021 |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-10-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Samantha Steckloff |
Subjects
Consumer protection: consumer solicitation
Consumer protection: unfair trade practices
Trade: consumer goods and services
Trade: fair trade practices
Consumer protection: unfair trade practices
Trade: consumer goods and services
Trade: fair trade practices