MI HB5482 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 24 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-14 - Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:34 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 24 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-14 - Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:34 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: suicide; suicide prevention hotline telephone number on student identification cards; require. Creates new act.
Title
Health: suicide; suicide prevention hotline telephone number on student identification cards; require. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 458 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:34 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2020 10:04 Am |
2020-10-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/01/2020 01:18 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 458 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-09-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-18 | House | Title Amended |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-06-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/12/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2020-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Schroeder |
Subjects
Communications: emergency 9-1-1
Education: public school academies
Education: school districts
Education: students
Health: emergency services
Health: suicide
Education: public school academies
Education: school districts
Education: students
Health: emergency services
Health: suicide