MI HB5477 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 468'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation; motor fuel tax; motor fuel tax; modify. Amends secs. 2, 3, 6, 8 & 152 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1002 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; motor fuel tax; motor fuel tax; modify. Amends secs. 2, 3, 6, 8 & 152 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1002 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 921 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 780 (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 759 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 633 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 633 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 662 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 524 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 (Y: 85 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 468'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 1/12/2015 @ 3:32 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 1/12/2015 @ 10:27 Am 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 11:52 Am 2014 Addenda
2014-12-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2014-12-19HouseConference Report Adopted By Senate
2014-12-19SenateSenate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 921 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2014-12-19SenateConference Report Received In Senate
2014-12-19HouseRetransmitted
2014-12-19HouseConference Report Adopted Roll Call # 780 Yeas 93 Nays 17
2014-05-29HouseRule Suspended
2014-12-19HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2014-12-19HouseConference Report Received
2014-12-11HouseReferred To Conference Committee 12/11/2014
2014-12-11HouseHouse Conferees Named 12/11/2014: Reps. Jim Stamas Rob Verheulen Marilyn Lane
2014-12-11HouseSenate Conferees Named 12/11/2014: Sens. Arlan Meekhof Michael Kowall Jim Ananich
2014-12-11HouseRe-returned From Senate With Nonconcurrence To House Substitute H-4 To Senate Substitute S-13
2014-12-11SenateSenate Named Conferees 12/11/2014: Sens. Arlan Meekhof, Michael Kowall, Jim Ananich
2014-12-11Senate Roll Call # 759 Yeas 7 Nays 30 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-12-11SenateHouse Substitute H-4 To Senate Substitute S-13 Nonconcurred In
2014-12-09SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2014-12-09SenateReturned From House With Substitute H-4 To Senate Substitute S-13
2014-12-04HouseRetransmitted
2014-12-04HouseTitle Amended
2014-12-04House Roll Call # 633 Yeas 58 Nays 51
2014-12-04HouseSenate Substitute S-13 Concurred In As Substituted H-4
2014-12-04HouseSubstitute H-4 Adopted And Amended
2014-11-13HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2014-11-13HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-13 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2014-11-13SenateTitle Amended
2014-11-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 662 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-11-13SenateSubstitute S-13 Adopted
2014-11-13SenateReconsider Vote Postponed
2014-11-13SenateSubstitute S-13 Defeated
2014-11-13SenateVote Reconsidered
2014-06-12SenateReconsider Vote Postponed
2014-06-12SenateDefeated Roll Call # 524 Yeas 17 Nays 20 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-06-12SenateSubstitute S-12 Adopted
2014-06-12SenateVote Reconsidered
2014-06-11SenateReconsider Vote Postponed
2014-06-11SenateSubstitute S-10 Defeated
2014-06-11SenateVote Reconsidered
2014-06-11SenateReconsider Vote Postponed
2014-06-11SenateSubstitute S-10 Offered
2014-06-11SenateVote Reconsidered
2014-06-11SenateReconsider Vote Postponed
2014-06-11SenateSubstitute S-9 Defeated
2014-06-11SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2014-05-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5
2014-05-21SenateSubstitute S-5 Concurred In
2014-05-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5
2014-05-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2014-05-21SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-05-21SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2014-05-13SenateReferred To Committee On Infrastructure Modernization
2014-05-08HouseTransmitted
2014-05-08HouseTitle Amended
2014-05-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 Yeas 85 Nays 24
2014-05-08HouseRead A Third Time
2014-05-08HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2014-05-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-05-08HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2014-05-08HouseSubstitute H-1 Not Adopted
2014-05-08HouseRead A Second Time
2014-05-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-05-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2014-04-29HousePrinted Bill Filed 04/24/2014
2014-04-23HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2014-04-23HouseRead A First Time
2014-04-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Rob Verheulen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5477
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2014-HEBH-5477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2014-HEBS-5477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/House/htm/2014-HNB-5477.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-05-07-042.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-05-08-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-05-21-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-06-12-057.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-11-13-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-12-04-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-11-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-12-19-087.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-19-085.htm

Bill Comments

feedback