MI HB5463 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 396'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 396'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; downtown development authorities; bylaws of authorities and taxable status; modify. Amends secs. 1, 4, 14 & 19 of 1975 PA 197 (MCL 125.1651 et seq.) & adds sec. 28a.
Title
Economic development; downtown development authorities; bylaws of authorities and taxable status; modify. Amends secs. 1, 4, 14 & 19 of 1975 PA 197 (MCL 125.1651 et seq.) & adds sec. 28a.
Sponsors
Rep. John Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 807 (Y: 58 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 822 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 822 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 396'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:48 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/19/2012 @ 3:29 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2012 @ 4:44 Pm |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 807 Yeas 58 Nays 49 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-05 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 822 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2012-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2012-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-23 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-05-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-03-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/09/2012 |
2012-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-08 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |