MI HB5461 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: food assistance; food stamp work requirement waivers; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 14n.
Title
Human services: food assistance; food stamp work requirement waivers; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 14n.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Pat Outman [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] | Rep. Luke Meerman [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Andrew Beeler [R] | Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/21/2021 |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-10-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |