MI HB5461 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 477'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 477'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of unemployment compensation fraud involving a knowing false misrepresentation of $3,500.00 to $25,000.00; enact. Amends sec. 14c, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14c).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of unemployment compensation fraud involving a knowing false misrepresentation of $3,500.00 to $25,000.00; enact. Amends sec. 14c, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14c).
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Callton [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Paul Muxlow [R] |
Rep. Deb Shaughnessy [R] | Sen. Michael Shirkey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 914 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 466 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 466 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 477'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:54 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 11:58 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2012 @ 3:42 Pm |
2012-12-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 914 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2012-06-14 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 466 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2012-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-03-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/09/2012 |
2012-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Deb Shaughnessy |