MI HB5456 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 100'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 100'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; civil actions; asbestos bankruptcy trust claims transparency act; enact. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding ch. 30A.
Title
Civil procedure; civil actions; asbestos bankruptcy trust claims transparency act; enact. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding ch. 30A.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 174 (Y: 83 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 56 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 56 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned Pa 100'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/2/2018 @ 4:20 Pm |
2018-04-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 11:56 Am |
2018-04-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:52 Pm |
2018-03-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll Call # 174 Yeas 83 Nays 25 |
2018-03-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2018-03-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-4 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-02-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 56 Yeas 58 Nays 51 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/30/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-01-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Wentworth |
Subjects
Civil procedure: civil actions
Civil procedure: defenses
Civil procedure: evidence
Torts: civil procedure
Torts: product liability
Civil procedure: defenses
Civil procedure: evidence
Torts: civil procedure
Torts: product liability