MI HB5454 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 633'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax; principal residence exemption; owners temporarily absent while rebuilding a demolished or destroyed dwelling; extend principal residence exemption to. Amends sec. 7cc of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7cc).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax; principal residence exemption; owners temporarily absent while rebuilding a demolished or destroyed dwelling; extend principal residence exemption to. Amends sec. 7cc of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7cc).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 923 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 633'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:18 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:45 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:34 Pm
2018-12-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-20HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-19SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 923 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-11-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-11-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-11-28SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-05-22SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2018-05-17HouseTransmitted
2018-05-17HouseTitle Amended
2018-05-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2018-05-17HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-16HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-16HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-05-16HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-05-16HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-01-31HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/30/2018
2018-01-30HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido
2018-01-30HouseRead A First Time

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5454
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5454.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5454.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5454.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5454.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-17-050.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-11-28-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-19-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback