MI HB5449 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; crime of making a false report of an urgent and immediate threat; provide for. Amends sec. 11b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5448'16
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; crime of making a false report of an urgent and immediate threat; provide for. Amends sec. 11b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5448'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-05-10 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 Yeas 104 Nays 4 |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/10/2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2016-03-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Jon Hoadley |
Subjects
Crimes: other
Crimes: penalties
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Law enforcement: investigations
Law enforcement: reports
Crimes: penalties
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Law enforcement: investigations
Law enforcement: reports