MI HB5438 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 119'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 119'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; human trafficking; definition of coercion; expand to include controlling or facilitating access to controlled substances. Amends sec. 462a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.462a).
Title
Crimes; human trafficking; definition of coercion; expand to include controlling or facilitating access to controlled substances. Amends sec. 462a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.462a).
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 125 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 125 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned Pa 119'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/26/2018 @ 11:18 Am |
2018-04-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/25/2018 @ 5:38 Pm |
2018-04-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/18/2018 @ 12:50 Pm |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 125 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Laura Cox |