MI HB5433 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: health professionals; licensing exam fees; require the department of licensing and regulatory affairs to work with the department of military and veterans affairs to ensure funding under the post-9/11 GI bill. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16305a.
Title
Health occupations: health professionals; licensing exam fees; require the department of licensing and regulatory affairs to work with the department of military and veterans affairs to ensure funding under the post-9/11 GI bill. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16305a.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Posthumus [R] | Rep. Tommy Brann [R] | Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] |
Rep. Luke Meerman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 (Y: 93 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2022-02-01 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 Yeas 93 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent |
2021-10-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Bryan Posthumus |
Subjects
Health occupations: health professionals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Veterans: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Veterans: other