MI HB5420 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax; exemptions; treatment of exemptions for state purposes after reduction of federal exemptions to zero; clarify and increase. Amends secs. 8, 12, 30, 30a, 52, 512 & 607 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.8 et seq.) & repeals sec. 30e of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30e). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5421'18, HB 5422'18

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax; exemptions; treatment of exemptions for state purposes after reduction of federal exemptions to zero; clarify and increase. Amends secs. 8, 12, 30, 30a, 52, 512 & 607 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.8 et seq.) & repeals sec. 30e of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30e). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5421'18, HB 5422'18

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 20 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-02-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-01-30SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2018-01-25HouseTransmitted
2018-01-25HouseTitle Amended
2018-01-25HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 20 Yeas 105 Nays 1
2018-01-25HouseRead A Third Time
2018-01-25HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-01-25HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-01-25HouseSubstitute H-4 Adopted And Amended
2018-01-25HouseRead A Second Time
2018-01-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-01-24HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4
2018-01-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2018
2018-01-16HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2018-01-16HouseRead A First Time
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Roger Hauck

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback