MI HB5419 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 365'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 365'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probate: guardians and conservators; do-not-resuscitate orders; authorize a guardian of a minor to execute. Amends sec. 5215 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5215). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5417'20
Title
Probate: guardians and conservators; do-not-resuscitate orders; authorize a guardian of a minor to execute. Amends sec. 5215 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5215). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5417'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 598 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 203 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 203 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 365'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 12:22 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 01/04/2021 10:14 Am |
2020-12-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 07:11 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 598 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-05-19 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 203 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Daire Rendon |