MI HB5412 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 97'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 97'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: other; definition of telemedicine; modify in the insurance code of 1956. Amends sec. 3476 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3476).
Title
Insurance: other; definition of telemedicine; modify in the insurance code of 1956. Amends sec. 3476 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3476).
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] | Rep. Phil Green [R] | Rep. Frank Liberati [D] | Rep. Mary Whiteford [R] |
Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Assigned Pa 97'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/24/2020 11:19 Am |
2020-06-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/24/2020 10:21 Am |
2020-06-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/17/2020 01:44 Pm |
2020-06-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-05-13 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-05-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Hank Vaupel |