MI HB5402 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Assigned Pa 71'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil procedure; civil actions; violations of temporary watercraft speed restrictions; classify as municipal civil infractions. Amends secs. 113, 8701 & 8703 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.113 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5401'19, HB 5463'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; civil actions; violations of temporary watercraft speed restrictions; classify as municipal civil infractions. Amends secs. 113, 8701 & 8703 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.113 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5401'19, HB 5463'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16HouseAssigned Pa 71'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-04-16HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 09:52 Am
2020-04-16HouseApproved By The Governor 04/02/2020 08:40 Am
2020-03-25HousePresented To The Governor 03/19/2020 01:16 Pm
2020-03-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-03-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-03-17HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-03-17SenateInserted Full Title
2020-03-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-03-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-03-17SenateRules Suspended
2020-03-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-03-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-03-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-03-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-02-26SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2020-02-25HouseTransmitted
2020-02-25HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-02-25HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-25HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-02-25HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-25HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2020-02-25HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-25HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-02-11HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/28/2020
2020-01-23HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2020-01-23HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Gary Eisen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5402
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBH-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBS-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2020-HNB-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0071.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-02-25-020.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-03-12-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-03-17-029.htm

Bill Comments

feedback