MI HB5401 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the commission of a hate crime; provide for. Amends sec. 16g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16g). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5400'24
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the commission of a hate crime; provide for. Amends sec. 16g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16g). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5400'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2024-01-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/18/2024 |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2024-01-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant |
Same As/Similar To
HB5400 (Same As) 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Subjects
Civil rights: sex discrimination and harassment
Civil rights: sexual orientation discrimination
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Civil rights: sexual orientation discrimination
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines