MI HB5396 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Assigned Pa 166'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations for fiscal year 2020-2021; provide for. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations for fiscal year 2020-2021; provide for. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 344 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 396 (Y: 101 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 374 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 296 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 219 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30HouseAssigned Pa 166'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-09-30HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 09/30/2020 02:36 Pm
2020-09-30HouseApproved By The Governor 09/30/2020 01:20 Pm
2020-09-24HousePresented To The Governor 09/28/2020 10:20 Am
2020-09-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-09-24HouseConference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect
2020-09-23SenateSenate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 344 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-23SenateConference Report Received In Senate
2020-09-23HouseRetransmitted
2020-09-23HouseConference Report Adopted Roll Call # 396 Yeas 101 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-09-23HouseConference Report Received
2020-09-22HouseReferred To Conference Committee 09/22/2020
2020-09-22SenateSenate Named Conferees 09/22/2020: Sens. Jim Stamas, Jon Bumstead, Curtis Hertel
2020-09-22HouseHouse Conferees Named 09/22/2020: Reps. Shane Hernandez Aaron Miller Jon Hoadley
2020-09-15HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 374 Yeas 0 Nays 109 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-09-15HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In
2020-09-15HouseRule Suspended
2020-09-15HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-09-15HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 296 Yeas 22 Nays 14 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-09-15SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-15SenateRules Suspended
2020-09-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-15SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-09-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-15SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2020-09-15SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2020-05-28SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseTransmitted
2020-05-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 219 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-05-27HouseRead A Third Time
2020-05-27HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-05-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-05-27HouseRead A Second Time
2020-05-27HousePlaced On Second Reading
2020-05-27HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2020-05-27HouseRule Suspended
2020-01-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/28/2020
2020-01-23HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Shane Hernandez

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5396
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBH-5396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBS-5396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2020-HNB-5396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0166.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-05-27-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-15-069.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-15-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-23-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-23-072.htm

Bill Comments

feedback