MI HB5386 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-28 - Reconsider Vote Defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-28 - Reconsider Vote Defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; physicians; quality assurance assessment tax on physicians; impose. Amends title of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) & adds sec. 16302.
Title
Occupations; physicians; quality assurance assessment tax on physicians; impose. Amends title of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) & adds sec. 16302.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-28 | Reconsider Vote Defeated | |
2009-10-28 | Defeated Roll Call # 556 Yeas 4 Nays 32 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-10-28 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-28 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-10-28 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2009-10-28 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2009-10-08 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2009-10-06 | Transmitted | |
2009-10-06 | Passed Roll Call # 490 Yeas 56 Nays 52 | |
2009-10-06 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-10-06 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-06 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-10-06 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2009-10-06 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-10-06 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-06 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-09-22 | Printed Bill Filed 09/18/2009 | |
2009-09-17 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-09-17 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-17 | Introduced By Representative George Cushingberry |