MI HB5385 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 315'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; intoxication or impairment; preliminary chemical testing for certain controlled substances; authorize, and provide for procedures and penalties for refusal. Amends secs. 625a, 625c, 625d & 625g of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625a et seq.) & adds sec. 43a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; intoxication or impairment; preliminary chemical testing for certain controlled substances; authorize, and provide for procedures and penalties for refusal. Amends secs. 625a, 625c, 625d & 625g of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625a et seq.) & adds sec. 43a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 548 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 548 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-10-22HouseAssigned Pa 315'14 With Immediate Effect
2014-10-22HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/14/2014 @ 11:50 Am
2014-10-22HouseApproved By The Governor 10/14/2014 @ 10:35 Am
2014-10-22HousePresented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:46 Pm
2014-10-02HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2014-10-02HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2014-10-02House Roll Call # 548 Yeas 104 Nays 3
2014-10-02HouseSenate Substitute S-2 Concurred In
2014-10-01HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2014-10-01HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2014-10-01SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2014-10-01SenateRules Suspended
2014-10-01SenateInserted Full Title
2014-10-01SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 1
2014-10-01SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2014-10-01SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2014-10-01SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2014-09-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2014-09-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-09-11SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2014-06-04SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2014-06-03HouseTransmitted
2014-06-03HouseTitle Amended
2014-06-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 Yeas 101 Nays 8
2014-06-03HouseAmended
2014-06-03HouseRead A Third Time
2014-05-28HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-05-28HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2014-05-28HouseRead A Second Time
2014-05-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-05-15HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2014-03-05HousePrinted Bill Filed 03/05/2014
2014-03-04HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2014-03-04HouseRead A First Time
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced By Representative Dan Lauwers

Same As/Similar To

SB0865 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5385
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5385.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2014-HEBH-5385.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2014-HEBS-5385.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/House/htm/2014-HNB-5385.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0315.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-05-15-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-06-03-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-09-11-062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-10-01-069.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-10-02-073.htm

Bill Comments

feedback