MI HB5384 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 192'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 192'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; education district; create to be successor to qualifying school district, and provide for certain reforms. Amends title & secs. 3, 5, 6, 11, 11a, 501, 502, 507, 522, 528, 551, 552, 561, 654, 705, 921, 1147, 1225, 1229, 1231, 1233, 1237, 1240, 1250, 1351a & 1356 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.3 et seq.); adds secs. 12b & 1233c & pt. 5b & repeals pt. 5a & secs. 403, 404, 412, 416a, 420, 421, 449 & 485 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.371 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0711'16
Title
Education; school districts; education district; create to be successor to qualifying school district, and provide for certain reforms. Amends title & secs. 3, 5, 6, 11, 11a, 501, 502, 507, 522, 528, 551, 552, 561, 654, 705, 921, 1147, 1225, 1229, 1231, 1233, 1237, 1240, 1250, 1351a & 1356 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.3 et seq.); adds secs. 12b & 1233c & pt. 5b & repeals pt. 5a & secs. 403, 404, 412, 416a, 420, 421, 449 & 485 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.371 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0711'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 420 (Y: 55 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 386 (Y: 55 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 216 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 386 (Y: 55 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 216 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Assigned Pa 192'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-07-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/21/2016 @ 2:56 Pm |
2016-07-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2016 @ 2:04 Pm |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/13/2016 @ 3:58 Pm |
2016-06-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-06-09 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 420 Yeas 55 Nays 54 |
2016-06-09 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-06-09 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-06-09 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 Yeas 19 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Defeated |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-06-02 | House | Retransmitted |
2016-06-02 | House | Title Amended |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed Roll Call # 386 Yeas 55 Nays 53 |
2016-06-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-02 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-06-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2016-06-02 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2016-06-02 | House | Returned To Second Reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Motion To Refer To Third Reading Reconsidered |
2016-06-02 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2016-06-02 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-06-02 | House | Returned As Requested |
2016-06-01 | House | House Requests Return |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-05 | House | Title Amended |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 216 Yeas 57 Nays 51 |
2016-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-05-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-05-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/18/2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Daniela Garcia |