MI HB5376 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 135'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 135'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: flow-through entities; entity flow-through tax; provide for. Amends secs. 30 & 623 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 & 206.623) & adds secs. 254 & 675 & pt. 4.
Title
Corporate income tax: flow-through entities; entity flow-through tax; provide for. Amends secs. 30 & 623 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 & 206.623) & adds secs. 254 & 675 & pt. 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tisdel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 633 (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 476 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 476 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 135'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2021 02:12 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2021 01:42 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2021 11:36 Am |
2021-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-12-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 633 Yeas 100 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-12-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2021-12-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Title Amended |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Adopted |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-10-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 476 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-10-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/07/2021 |
2021-10-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2021-10-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-10-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Mark Tisdel |
Subjects
Corporate income tax: credits
Corporate income tax: flow-through entities
Individual income tax: deductions
Corporate income tax: flow-through entities
Individual income tax: deductions