MI HB5374 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Assigned Pa 391'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Assigned Pa 391'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; pedestrians; definition of motor vehicle; exclude power-driven mobility devices under certain circumstances, and include disabled individuals using wheelchairs or other mobility devices in definition of pedestrian. Amends secs. 33 & 39 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.33 & 257.39) & adds sec. 43c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5834'18
Title
Traffic control; pedestrians; definition of motor vehicle; exclude power-driven mobility devices under certain circumstances, and include disabled individuals using wheelchairs or other mobility devices in definition of pedestrian. Amends secs. 33 & 39 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.33 & 257.39) & adds sec. 43c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5834'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 811 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 751 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 342 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 751 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 342 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | Assigned Pa 391'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2018 @ 2:48 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/19/2018 @ 12:27 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:16 Pm |
2018-12-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-12 | House | Roll Call # 811 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 751 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-17 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 342 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-05-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-12-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/13/2017 |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |