MI HB5362 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Assigned Pa 158'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Assigned Pa 158'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; liability for damage to motor vehicles; increase limit. Amends sec. 3135 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3135).
Title
Insurance; no-fault; liability for damage to motor vehicles; increase limit. Amends sec. 3135 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3135).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 279 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 181 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 181 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | House | Assigned Pa 158'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-06-12 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/7/2012 @ 2:52 Pm |
2012-06-12 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/7/2012 @ 11:39 Am |
2012-05-29 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/29/2012 @ 2:35 Pm |
2012-05-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-05-22 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-05-22 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 279 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2012-05-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-05-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-04-19 | House | Transmitted |
2012-04-19 | House | Passed Roll Call # 181 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-04-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-04-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-04-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-02-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/08/2012 |
2012-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-02-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Cindy Denby |