MI HB5357 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; requirement that reporting unit pay unfunded actuarial accrued liability associated with employment of a retired substitute teacher; eliminate, and extend sunset for certain retirees reemployed by or at a reporting unit without forfeiting his or her retirement allowance. Amends sec. 61 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1361).
Title
Retirement; public school employees; requirement that reporting unit pay unfunded actuarial accrued liability associated with employment of a retired substitute teacher; eliminate, and extend sunset for certain retirees reemployed by or at a reporting unit without forfeiting his or her retirement allowance. Amends sec. 61 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1361).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/21/2020 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2020-01-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5357 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5357.htm |