MI HB5340 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management: escheats; contracts with certain locators; modify. Amends sec. 36 of 1995 PA 29 (MCL 567.256).
Title
State financing and management: escheats; contracts with certain locators; modify. Amends sec. 36 of 1995 PA 29 (MCL 567.256).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 427 (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-10-14 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 10/15/2020 |
2020-10-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/01/2020 01:16 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 427 Yeas 77 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-06-03 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 Yeas 82 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/21/2020 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Wendell Byrd |