MI HB5336 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil procedure; remedies; uniform commercial real estate receivership act; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 18, 19, 20, 21, 24 & 25 of 2018 PA 16 (MCL 554.1011 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; remedies; uniform commercial real estate receivership act; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 18, 19, 20, 21, 24 & 25 of 2018 PA 16 (MCL 554.1011 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 130 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-07-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-07-22SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-03-04SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2020-03-03HouseTransmitted
2020-03-03HouseTitle Amended
2020-03-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 130 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted
2020-03-03HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute (h-2) Not Adopted
2020-02-26HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-25HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-01-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2020
2020-01-15HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-01-15HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback