MI HB5334 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; mandatory reporting of sexual assault of one child against another child; require. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623) & adds sec. 3b.
Title
Children; protection; mandatory reporting of sexual assault of one child against another child; require. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623) & adds sec. 3b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Law And Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-12-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/06/2017 |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |
Subjects
Children: protection
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Education: employees
Transportation: school vehicles
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Education: employees
Transportation: school vehicles