MI HB5323 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Assigned Pa 4'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Use tax: exemptions; identifying information required for claiming exemption; include purchaser's license number issued by the Michigan liquor control commission to satisfy the requirements. Amends secs. 14a & 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104a & 205.104b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax: exemptions; identifying information required for claiming exemption; include purchaser's license number issued by the Michigan liquor control commission to satisfy the requirements. Amends secs. 14a & 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104a & 205.104b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01HouseAssigned Pa 4'22 With Immediate Effect
2022-02-01HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 02/01/2022 01:52 Pm
2022-02-01HouseApproved By The Governor 02/01/2022 12:36 Pm
2022-01-25HousePresented To The Governor 01/20/2022 01:40 Pm
2022-01-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2022-01-19HouseFull Title Agreed To
2022-01-19HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2022-01-19SenateInserted Full Title
2022-01-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2022-01-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2022-01-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-12-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-12-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-12-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-11-09SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2021-11-04HouseTransmitted
2021-11-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
2021-11-04HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-03HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-03HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-11-03HouseRead A Second Time
2021-10-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-10-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-09-23HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/22/2021
2021-09-22HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2021-09-22HouseRead A First Time
2021-09-22HouseIntroduced By Representative Tenisha Yancey

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5323
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-5323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-5323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2022-PA-0004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5323-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5322-48D74D71.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5322-B997CF65.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5322-9471A208.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5322-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5322-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5322-8674B60C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-13-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-04-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-09-098.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-01-19-003.htm

Bill Comments

feedback