MI HB5315 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 121'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 121'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; license to serve alcohol on certain premises of Northern Michigan University; allow. Amends sec. 513 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1513).
Title
Liquor; licenses; license to serve alcohol on certain premises of Northern Michigan University; allow. Amends sec. 513 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1513).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 257 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 121'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:36 Pm |
2020-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/01/2020 10:48 Am |
2020-07-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/25/2020 12:02 Pm |
2020-06-23 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-23 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-06-23 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 257 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-06-23 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-02-18 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/14/2020 |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Sara Cambensy |
Subjects
Higher education: state universities
Liquor: licenses
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Liquor: licenses
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs