MI HB5308 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration plates; disabled veteran registration plate sticker; provide for. Amends secs. 674, 675, 801, 803f & 805 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.674 et seq.) & adds sec. 68c.
Title
Vehicles: registration plates; disabled veteran registration plate sticker; provide for. Amends secs. 674, 675, 801, 803f & 805 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.674 et seq.) & adds sec. 68c.
Sponsors
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Kevin Coleman [D] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] | Rep. Matthew Maddock [R] |
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. John Roth [R] | Rep. Sue Allor [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2021-09-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/21/2021 |
2021-09-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2021-09-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: parking
Vehicles: registration plates
Veterans: other
Traffic control: parking
Vehicles: registration plates
Veterans: other