MI HB5303 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; other; retirement benefits for township employees subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act; provide for. Amends sec. 110b of 1846 RS 16 (MCL 41.110b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5298'17
Title
Retirement; other; retirement benefits for township employees subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act; provide for. Amends sec. 110b of 1846 RS 16 (MCL 41.110b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5298'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2017-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 Yeas 107 Nays 3 |
2017-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-12-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/30/2017 |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Kathy Crawford |
Subjects
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: other
Townships: employees and officers
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: other
Townships: employees and officers