MI HB5300 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers; ethics; financial management teams and the local government retirement stability board; exempt from the incompatible public offices act. Amends sec. 3 of 1978 PA 566 (MCL 15.183). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5299'17
Title
Public employees and officers; ethics; financial management teams and the local government retirement stability board; exempt from the incompatible public offices act. Amends sec. 3 of 1978 PA 566 (MCL 15.183). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5299'17
Sponsors
Rep. James Lower [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 456 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2017-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 456 Yeas 107 Nays 3 |
2017-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-12-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/30/2017 |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative James Lower |