MI HB5288 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; use of a digital or electronic signature to sign an absent voter ballot application; prohibit. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Title
Elections: absent voters; use of a digital or electronic signature to sign an absent voter ballot application; prohibit. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 (Y: 58 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2022-03-10 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 Yeas 58 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-09-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2021 |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-09-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Beeler |