MI HB5276 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Assigned Pa 66'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Children: child abuse or child neglect; identification of certain child abuse and neglect claims that require listing in the central registry and mandatory reporting required for child abuse caused by any individual 18 years of age or older; provide for. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7d, 7e, 7g, 8b, 8d, 9a & 18 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children: child abuse or child neglect; identification of certain child abuse and neglect claims that require listing in the central registry and mandatory reporting required for child abuse caused by any individual 18 years of age or older; provide for. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7d, 7e, 7g, 8b, 8d, 9a & 18 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 166 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 623 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05HouseAssigned Pa 66'22 With Immediate Effect
2022-05-05HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 05/05/2022 04:54 Pm
2022-05-05HouseApproved By The Governor 05/05/2022 02:52 Pm
2022-04-28HousePresented To The Governor 04/28/2022 12:11 Pm
2022-04-26HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2022-04-26HouseFull Title Agreed To
2022-04-26HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 166 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2022-04-26HouseSenate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
2022-04-26HouseRule Suspended
2022-04-26HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2022-04-26HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2022-04-20SenateTitle Amended
2022-04-20SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2022-04-20SenateSubstitute (s-3) Adopted
2022-03-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2022-03-22SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2022-03-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2022-03-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2022-03-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2022-03-15SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2022-01-12SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-12-14HouseTransmitted
2021-12-14HouseTitle Amended
2021-12-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 623 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2021-12-14HouseRead A Third Time
2021-12-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-12-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-12-14HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-12-14HouseRead A Second Time
2021-12-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-12-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-08-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 08/18/2021
2021-08-18HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2021-08-18HouseRead A First Time
2021-08-18HouseIntroduced By Representative Kevin Hertel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5276
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5276.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5276.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-5276.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-5276.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2022-PA-0066.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5276-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5276-00B718.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5276-0Q2331.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5274-F3DB765E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5274-D2D8C6D2.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5274-320A7D99.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5274-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5274-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-07-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-14-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-15-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-04-20-036.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-04-26-035.htm

Bill Comments

feedback