MI HB5275 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Assigned Pa 64'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Assigned Pa 64'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children: child abuse or child neglect; statewide electronic case management system for child abuse and child neglect cases; create and maintain. Amends sec. 7j of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627j).
Title
Children: child abuse or child neglect; statewide electronic case management system for child abuse and child neglect cases; create and maintain. Amends sec. 7j of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627j).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 165 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 622 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 622 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Assigned Pa 64'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-05-05 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/05/2022 04:50 Pm |
2022-05-05 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/05/2022 02:50 Pm |
2022-04-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 04/28/2022 12:09 Pm |
2022-04-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-04-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-04-26 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 165 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-04-26 | House | Senate Substitute (s-4) Concurred In |
2022-04-26 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-04-26 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-04-26 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-4) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Substitute (s-4) Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-12-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 622 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-08-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/18/2021 |
2021-08-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-08-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-08-18 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |