MI HB5273 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 354'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 354'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; other; veto power for successor judges related to certain parole decisions; eliminate. Amends sec. 34 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.234).
Title
Corrections; other; veto power for successor judges related to certain parole decisions; eliminate. Amends sec. 34 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.234).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 687 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Criminal Justice (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Criminal Justice (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 354'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2016 @ 1:28 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 10:46 Am |
2016-12-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/9/2016 @ 2:42 Pm |
2016-12-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 687 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-05-12 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 Yeas 96 Nays 12 |
2016-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-03-15 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/28/2016 |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Pagel |