MI HB5269 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 425'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 425'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; notaries public; crimes requiring revocation of notary's commission; revise. Amends sec. 41 of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.301).
Title
Occupations; notaries public; crimes requiring revocation of notary's commission; revise. Amends sec. 41 of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.301).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 970 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 113 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 113 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 425'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2012 @ 2:17 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 9:12 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 10:02 Am |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 970 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2012-03-13 | House | Transmitted |
2012-03-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 113 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-01-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/25/2012 |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs |
2012-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |
Subjects
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
Occupations, notaries public
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, notaries public
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs