MI HB5268 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: absent voters; sending unsolicited absent voter ballot applications; prohibit. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: absent voters; sending unsolicited absent voter ballot applications; prohibit. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-10-19HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2021-08-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2021
2021-08-17HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2021-08-17HouseRead A First Time
2021-08-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Calley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5268
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5268.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5268-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5268-1B210BFF.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5268-6AA47D4E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5268-89EBBDC3.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5268-EB2784D2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-19-085.htm

Bill Comments

feedback