MI HB5267 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 108'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 108'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax: exemptions; sale of feminine hygiene products; exempt. Amends secs. 4a & 25 of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54a & 205.75).
Title
Sales tax: exemptions; sale of feminine hygiene products; exempt. Amends secs. 4a & 25 of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54a & 205.75).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 413 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Assigned Pa 108'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/05/2021 02:15 Pm |
2021-11-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/04/2021 01:15 Pm |
2021-11-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/29/2021 11:14 Am |
2021-10-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 413 Yeas 32 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-10-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 Yeas 94 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-10-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-10-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-09-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-08-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2021 |
2021-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Bryan Posthumus |