MI HB5261 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 41'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 41'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: patient directives; circumstances in which an individual with a nonopioid directive form may be administered an opioid; modify. Amends sec. 9145 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.9145).
Title
Health: patient directives; circumstances in which an individual with a nonopioid directive form may be administered an opioid; modify. Amends sec. 9145 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.9145).
Sponsors
Rep. Abdullah Hammoud [D] | Rep. Pamela Hornberger [R] | Rep. Mary Whiteford [R] | Rep. Abraham Aiyash [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Sen. Mary Cavanagh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 561 (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 561 (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned Pa 41'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/23/2022 10:50 Am |
2022-03-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/23/2022 09:47 Am |
2022-03-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/15/2022 09:17 Am |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-12-01 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 561 Yeas 97 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2021-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-10 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-08-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2021 |
2021-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Abdullah Hammoud |
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Health facilities: patient directives
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: patient choice
Health: patient directives
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health facilities: patient directives
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: patient choice
Health: patient directives
State agencies (existing): health and human services